OR SB515 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires employee of certain licensed premises who is permittee to make report if permittee has reasonable belief that sex trafficking is occurring at premises or that minor is employed or contracted as performer at premises in manner violating Oregon Liquor Control Commission rules. Requires employee of certain licensed premises who is permittee to make report if permittee has reasonable belief that sex trafficking is occurring at premises or that minor is employed or contracted as performer at premises in manner violating Oregon Liquor Control Commission rules. Exempts permittee from liability for good faith report. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to mandatory reporting by service permit holders; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | Senate | Effective date, September 25, 2021. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 44, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-05-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Wilde. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Alonso Leon, Nearman, Power. |
2021-05-06 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred to General Government. |
2021-04-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Gelser, Thomsen. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |