OR SB511 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Water Resources Department for distribution to Harney County for ground water study and installation of water conservation measures.
Title
Relating to ground water in Harney County.
Sponsors
Sen. Cliff Bentz [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and referral to Rules and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommedation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules and then Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |