OR SB502 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that court hold hearing on petition to appoint fiduciary filed by Oregon Public Guardian and Conservator or county public guardian and conservator. Requires court to appoint legal counsel for respondent in proceeding. Requires payment for appointed counsel from guardianship or conservatorship estate of respondent or at state expense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to proceedings for appointment of a fiduciary brought by a public guardian and conservator.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2017-04-20SenateRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2017-04-13SenateWork Session held.
2017-03-01SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-01-17SenateReferred to Judiciary, then Ways and Means.
2017-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback