OR SB501 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires court to appoint legal counsel for respondent or protected person in protective proceeding under certain circumstances. Requires payment for appointed counsel from guardianship or conservatorship estate of respondent or protected person or at state expense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to appointment of legal counsel for certain persons in protective proceedings.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-07SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2017-03-01SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-01-17SenateReferred to Judiciary, then Ways and Means.
2017-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback