OR SB493 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new manner of committing crime of assault in the fourth degree when person with criminal negligence causes serious physical injury to vulnerable user of public way by means of motor vehicle. Punishes by maximum of one year's imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both.
Title
Relating to assault.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Chapter 337, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed.Ayes, 40; Nays, 15--Barreto, Buehler, Fahey, Greenlick, Heard, Hernandez, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Rayfield, Reschke, Sanchez, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 5--Boone, Gorsek, Nearman, Piluso, Sprenger. |
2017-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-31 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 31, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-23 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-18 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-05-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 19; nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, DeBoer, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Thatcher; excused, 1--Johnson. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary, then Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |