OR SB490 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Effective date, September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Effective date, September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Higher Education Coordinating Commission to distribute moneys to Area Health Education Center program of Oregon Health and Science University for specified purposes. Directs Oregon Department of Administrative Services] Higher Education Coordinating Commission to distribute moneys to Area Health Education Center program of Oregon Health and Science University for specified purposes. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to family medicine residency training programs; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-15 | Senate | Effective date, September 24, 2023. |
2023-08-15 | Senate | Chapter 574, 2023 Laws. |
2023-07-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reynolds. Passed. Ayes, 34; Nays, 20--Boice, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Cramer, Elmer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Javadi, Levy B, Lewis, Mannix, McIntire, Morgan, Osborne, Owens, Scharf, Smith G, Stout, Wallan; Excused, 5--Boshart Davis, Diehl, Nguyen H, Reschke, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Conrad. |
2023-06-21 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 22, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-06-21 | House | Second reading. |
2023-06-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-06-20 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-06-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Anderson. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 7--Bonham, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Smith DB, Weber; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Carried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Health Care, then Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |