OR SB488 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, July 15, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Department of Corrections to offer immunization against influenza virus to each inmate in physical custody of department. Requires department to schedule appointment to receive immunization for each inmate who does not decline immunization in writing. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to immunization against influenza for incarcerated persons; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-08SenateEffective date, July 15, 2019.
2019-08-08SenateChapter 550, 2019 Laws.
2019-07-23SenateEffective date, July 15, 2019.
2019-07-23SenateChapter 550, 2019 Laws.
2019-07-15SenateGovernor signed.
2019-06-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-06-24SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-18HouseThird reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 2--Post, Wallan.
2019-06-17HouseCarried over to June 18, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2019-06-13HouseSecond reading.
2019-06-12HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-06-11HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-06-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-06-10SenateThird reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 29.
2019-06-06SenateSecond reading.
2019-06-05SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2019-05-31SenateWork Session held.
2019-05-29SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2019-05-29SenateWork Session held.
2019-05-20SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
2019-03-19SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2019-03-19SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-03-11SenateWork Session held.
2019-02-06SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB488
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB488/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB488/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB488/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB488/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB488/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB488/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28134
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29789
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=473511
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=475901

Bill Comments

feedback