OR SB478 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Effective date, July 27, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Oregon Health Authority to establish and maintain list of designated high priority chemicals of concern for children's health used in children's products and to periodically review and revise list. Requires authority to post certain information on authority's website. Requires manufacturers of certain children's products to provide notice to authority regarding chemicals on list. Requires certain manufacturers to take additional actions after certain dates to comply with notice requirement. Allows authority to enter into certain data sharing agreements with other states. Allows authority to participate in Interstate Chemicals Clearinghouse. Allows authority to establish certain fees by rule. Allows authority to impose civil penalties. Allows authority to accept certain funding. Establishes High Priority Chemicals of Concern for Children's Health Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to authority. Specifies uses of moneys. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by authority. Becomes operative January 1, 2016. Requires first biennial notice to be submitted by manufacturers to authority no later than January 1, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to high priority chemicals of concern for children's health; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-07-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) Request referral to Ways and Means (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-28SenateEffective date, July 27, 2015.
2015-07-28SenateChapter 786, 2015 Laws.
2015-07-27SenateGovernor signed.
2015-07-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-07-07SenatePresident signed.
2015-07-03HouseThird reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer. Passed.Ayes, 43; Nays, 17--Barreto, Bentz, Esquivel, Heard, Huffman, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Nearman, Olson, Post, Smith, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson.
2015-07-02HouseSecond reading.
2015-07-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2015-07-01HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2015-07-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2015-07-01SenateThird reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed.Ayes, 18; nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters; excused, 1--Olsen.
2015-07-01SenateMotion to refer to Rules with recommendation to adopt the -22 amendments failed.Ayes, 11; nays, 18--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney; excused, 1--Olsen.
2015-07-01SenateMade a Special Order of Business by voice vote.
2015-06-30SenateSecond reading.
2015-06-29SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2015-06-24SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-18SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2015-06-18SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-10SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-06-09SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-06-03SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2015-04-27SenateMinority Recommendation: Do pass with different amendments. (Printed A-Eng. Minority)
2015-04-27SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2015-04-27SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng). Requesting referral to Ways and Means. (not concurring Olsen, Thomsen)
2015-04-15SenateWork Session held.
2015-03-02SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-01-20SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources.
2015-01-12SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB478
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB478/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB478/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB478/Senate%20Minority%20Report%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB478/Minority%20Report%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB478/Senate%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB478/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB478/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB478/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/21694
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/21890
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23195
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=363633
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=364512

Bill Comments

feedback