OR SB474 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective date, June 20, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective date, June 20, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces length of time of parental desertion or abandonment of child resulting in forfeiture of parent's intestate share of child's estate or parent's interest in property transferred from child to parent by transfer on death deed in parental forfeiture action to one year if person who would benefit from forfeiture is child or sibling of deceased child or three years for all others. Modifies] Reduces length of time of parental desertion or abandonment of child resulting in forfeiture of parent's intestate share of child's estate and] or parent's interest in property transferred from child to parent by transfer on death deed in parental forfeiture action to one year if person who would benefit from forfeiture is child or sibling of deceased child or three years for all others. Modifies burden of proof in parental forfeiture action to preponderance of evidence if person who would benefit from forfeiture is child or sibling of deceased child. Extends deadline for commencing parental forfeiture action to no later than one year after decedent's date of death if notice to interested persons not published. Prohibits parent or stepparent who abandoned child from receiving damages for wrongful death of child. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to forfeiture of parent's share of child's estate; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | Effective date, June 20, 2019. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Chapter 461, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 29. |
2019-06-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Stark. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 2--Hernandez, Speaker Kotek; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Keny-Guyer, Prusak, Smith Warner. |
2019-06-03 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-05-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-05-01 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-03-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 26; Excused, 4--Johnson, President Courtney, Steiner Hayward, Thomsen. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |