OR SB457 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits insurer from denying coverage under health benefit plan for covered services provided to person in custody of county sheriff.
Title
Relating to health care.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Bates [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by Order of the President. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage but w/amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng) |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |