OR SB443 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires use of headlights at all times. Punishes by maximum fine of $1,000.
Title
Relating to vehicle headlight use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |