OR SB442 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - Effective date, January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - Effective date, January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to vehicle registration plates; and appropriating money.
Title
Relating to vehicle registration plates; and appropriating money.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-03 | Effective date, January 1, 2012. | |
2011-08-03 | Chapter 709, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-08-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-28 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-27 | President signed. | |
2011-06-23 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Cameron. | |
2011-06-23 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Cameron. Passed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 11--Barnhart, Beyer, Buckley, Cowan, Garrard, Gelser, Greenlick, Hunt, Nolan, Tomei, Speaker Roblan; Absent, 1--Smith G.. | |
2011-06-22 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-21 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-06-20 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-06-20 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-06-17 | Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed. Ayes, 28; nays, 2--Beyer, Johnson. | |
2011-06-16 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-16 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2011-06-15 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-10 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-06-10 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-07 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. | |
2011-05-10 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-05-04 | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. | |
2011-04-15 | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. | |
2011-04-15 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2011-04-11 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-07 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to Business, Transportation and Economic Development. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |