OR SB430 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes procedure for charging aggravated version of certain assault and attempted murder offenses when defendant causes permanent physical injury to victim during commission of crime. Establishes procedure for charging aggravated version of certain assault and attempted murder offenses when defendant causes permanent physical injury to victim during commission of crime. Provides that if defendant is convicted of aggravated offense, court shall sentence defendant to 300 months' imprisonment. Authorizes court to impose lesser sentence in certain circumstances.
Title
Relating to permanent physical injury.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] | Sen. Lynn Findley [R] | Sen. Kim Thatcher [R] | Sen. Fred Girod [R] |
Sen. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate Withdraw from Committee (Y: 12 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Meek, Prozanski, Sollman. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Motion to withdraw from committee on Judiciary failed. Ayes, 12; Nays, 16--Campos, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser Blouin, Golden, Jama, Lieber, Manning Jr, Meek, Patterson, Prozanski, Sollman, Steiner, Taylor, Woods, President Wagner; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Hansell. |
2023-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |