OR SB423 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows physician assistants to dispense controlled substances in Schedules III and IV under federal Controlled Substances Act. Requires physician assistants to report dispensing of controlled substances to Oregon Health Authority.
Title
Relating to physician assistants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Chapter 335, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 26; nays, 3--Girod, Olsen, Thomsen; excused, 1--Monnes Anderson. |
2017-06-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Alonso Leon. Passed.Ayes, 40; Nays, 13--Barreto, Buehler, Esquivel, Hayden, Heard, Johnson, Lewis, Olson, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wilson; Excused, 5--Boone, Gorsek, Nearman, Piluso, Sprenger; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Bentz, Noble. |
2017-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-31 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 31, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-23 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-05-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-03-30 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 3--Girod, Olsen, Thomsen; excused, 1--Hass. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |