OR SB418 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 521, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 521, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Director of Department of Land Conservation and Development, at city's request, to approve or remand sequential phases of work tasks related to potential amendment of urban growth boundary.
Title
Relating to local legislative review of urban growth boundaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-04 | Senate | Chapter 521, 2017 Laws. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Winters. |
2017-06-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lively. Passed.Ayes, 52; Nays, 4--Evans, Fahey, Helm, Marsh; Excused, 3--Bentz, Boone, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-06-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 14, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-06 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2017-06-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2017-04-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |