OR SB39 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date, October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date, October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides Board on Public Safety Standards and Training and Department of Public Safety Standards and Training with powers related to suspension of private security providers. Expands board's duty to establish standards for issuing, denying, renewing, suspending and revoking licenses to apply to licenses and certificates of private security professionals and instructors. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die. .
Title
Relating to private security providers; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | Senate | Effective date, October 6, 2017. |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Chapter 227, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-05-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Evans; Excused, 3--Boone, Kennemer, Smith G. |
2017-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-16 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 15, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 11, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 10, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-08 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-02 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Johnson, Steiner Hayward. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Carried over to 02-21 by unanimous consent. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Carried over to 02-16 by unanimous consent. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |