OR SB383 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date, January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date, January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies pleading requirements for claims against design professionals.
Title
Relating to pleading requirements for actions against design professionals.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2016. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Chapter 610, 2015 Laws. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-06-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 28; nays, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Thomsen. |
2015-06-11 | House | Third reading. Carried by Fagan. Passed.Ayes, 43; Nays, 5--Barton, Heard, McLane, Sprenger, Whitsett; Excused, 4--Esquivel, Gorsek, Smith Warner, Taylor; Excused for Business of the House, 8--Bentz, Davis, Hayden, McKeown, Nathanson, Piluso, Vega Pederson, Speaker Kotek. |
2015-06-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 11, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-06-09 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2015-06-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Effectiveness. |
2015-03-19 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Shields. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |