OR SB375 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs court to inform defendant of potential commitment or conditional discharge prior to accepting plea of guilty except for insanity. Directs court to state on record and include in order maximum period of commitment or conditional discharge upon entry of judgment] finding of guilty except for insanity. Requires court to find defendant guilty except for insanity and enter disposition order instead of entering judgment of guilty except for insanity.
Title
Relating to guilty except for insanity.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 329, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by McLane. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Barker, Boles, Clem; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2019-05-30 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-22 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-05-13 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-03-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 26; Excused, 4--Johnson, President Courtney, Steiner Hayward, Thomsen. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |