OR SB374 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Effective date, July 7, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Effective date, July 7, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Department of Transportation to issue driver licenses, driver permits and identification cards that meet requirements of federal Real ID Act of 2005. Real ID compliant documents shall be known as Real IDs. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Real ID Act of 2005; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to resolve conflicts. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to resolve conflicts. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-19 | Senate | Effective date, July 7, 2017. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Chapter 568, 2017 Laws. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 27; nays, 2--Girod, Thomsen; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2017-07-06 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Kotek. |
2017-07-06 | House | Third reading as Special Order of Business. Carried by Nearman. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Speaker Kotek; Excused, 1--Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Kennemer, Smith G. |
2017-07-05 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2017-07-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-27 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-06-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 2--Girod, Olsen. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session cancelled. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |