OR SB371 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes pilot programs for purpose of appointing legal counsel for children in certain contested child custody and parenting time proceedings. Establishes pilot programs for purpose of appointing legal counsel for children in contested domestic relations] certain contested child custody and parenting time proceedings. Sunsets pilot programs on January 2, 2025. Appropriates moneys for pilot programs. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.].

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to appointment of attorneys for children in domestic relations proceedings.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2019-03-29SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2019-03-29SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-03-21SenateWork Session held.
2019-03-06SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback