OR SB365 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-21 - Effective date, August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes requirements for coverage of applied behavior analysis for treatment of autism spectrum disorders by health benefit plans, health care service contractors, Public Employees' Benefit Board and Oregon Educators Benefit Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to treatment for autism spectrum disorders; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-21SenateEffective date, August 14, 2013.
2013-08-21SenateChapter 771, 2013 Laws.
2013-08-14SenateGovernor signed.
2013-07-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2013-07-03SenatePresident signed.
2013-07-01HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Buckley. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 2--Bailey, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Esquivel, Witt.
2013-07-01HouseRules suspended. Second reading.
2013-07-01HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2013-07-01HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2013-07-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2013-06-29SenateThird reading. Carried by Bates. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Boquist, George.
2013-06-28SenateSecond reading.
2013-06-27SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2013-06-26SenateWork Session held.
2013-06-20SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2013-06-20SenateWork Session held.
2013-06-12SenatePublic Hearing held.
2013-04-30SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2013-04-24SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2013-04-24SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
2013-04-18SenateWork Session held.
2013-04-15SenateWork Session held.
2013-04-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2013-01-16SenateReferred to Health Care and Human Services.
2013-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback