OR SB360 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates whole or partial exemption from additional requirements for fish screens, by-pass devices or fish passages for hydroelectric projects proposed for construction in preexisting artificial delivery systems partially or entirely within Astoria city limits or partially or entirely on property owned in whole or in part by City of Astoria.
Title
Relating to fish supportive measures for hydroelectric projects located in artificial delivery systems; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |