OR SB357 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Liquor Control Commission to study issues related to revenue derived from sales of alcoholic beverages, and to report recommendations to Legislative Assembly by September 1, 2022. Directs Oregon Liquor Control Commission to study issues related to revenue derived from sales of alcoholic beverages, and to report recommendations to Legislative Assembly by September 1, 2022. Sunsets December 1, 2022.
Title
Relating to revenue derived from sales of alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Health Care, then Finance and Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB357 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB357/Introduced |