OR SB356 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Renames crime of intimidation as bias crime. Includes commission of assault in fourth degree as bias crime in second degree when committed by one person and motivated by perception of victim's race, color, religion, ethnicity, gender, sexual orientation, disability or national origin. Imposes 10-day mandatory minimum term of incarceration upon conviction of bias crime in second degree. Prohibits prosecuting attorney from charging act determined crime constituting domestic violence as bias crime in second degree. Modifies authority of certain law enforcement officials to bring civil action based on commission of bias crime. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to bias crimes; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-04-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Vote explanations filed by Boquist, Linthicum. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick, Manning Jr. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 2--Boquist, Linthicum; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |