OR SB349 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits small woodland owner to register vehicle as farm vehicle if woodland and vehicle meet certain requirements.
Title
Relating to farm vehicle registration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation, then Finance and Revenue. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |