OR SB348 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grants higher property tax exemption for property of veterans with disabilities. Grants higher property tax exemption for property of veterans with disabilities. Grants exemption for veteran's surviving spouse who remains unmarried. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to property tax exemption for disabled veterans; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Olsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Withdraw from Committee (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Motion to withdraw from committee on Finance and Revenue failed. Ayes, 11; Nays, 18--Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser, Golden, Gorsek, Heard, Jama, Johnson, Lieber, Patterson, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Wagner; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |