OR SB346 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Declares policy of state to use zero-based budgeting in developing biennial budget plan. Requires state agencies to include information justifying proposed expenditures in agency request budgets filed with Oregon Department of Administrative Services. Applies to biennia beginning on or after July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to zero-based budgeting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |