OR SB336 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 483, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 483, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires inclusion of certain information in notification that contractor or business sends to Construction Contractors Board upon person ceasing to be responsible managing individual for contractor or business. Allows contractor or business to operate with temporary responsible managing individual for limited period.
Title
Relating to responsible managing individuals.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-04 | Senate | Chapter 483, 2017 Laws. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Olsen, Thatcher declared potential conflict of interest. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 30. |
2017-06-06 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hack. Passed.Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Johnson, McKeown, Nosse, Power, Stark. |
2017-06-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-31 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-30 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-05-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Olsen, Thatcher declared potential conflict of interest. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Dembrow, Johnson. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Carried over to 02-23 by unanimous consent. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |