OR SB336 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates requirement for special relationship to establish liability of local government for economic injuries incurred by person acting in good faith reliance on negligent misrepresentation by local government of effect of comprehensive plan and land use regulations.
Title
Relating to tort liability for land use errors by public body.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral. Referred to Judiciary by order of the President. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |