OR SB323 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Instructs Oregon Institute of Occupational Health Sciences to conduct study related to provision of medical services in workers' compensation claims. Requires that report be submitted to Workers' Compensation Management-Labor Advisory Committee and Legislative Assembly by July 1, 2016. Mandates payment of expenses for study from funds continuously appropriated to institute.
Title
Relating to studies on the provision of medical services in workers' compensation claims.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB323 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB323/Introduced |