OR SB321 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies procedures by which person convicted of felony initiates proceedings to obtain DNA testing. Directs State Court Administrator to develop forms for use during court proceedings on DNA test requests. Authorizes person requesting testing to file motion requesting property and evidence control and disposition records and other written materials relating to prior forensic testing. Modifies requirements of motion and accompanying documents for DNA testing. Requires person to serve district attorney with copy of all prior sworn statements of person concerning underlying prosecution. Modifies findings that, if made by court, require court to order DNA testing. Establishes findings that, if made by court, authorize court to order DNA testing. Creates procedures by which party seeking testing at certain laboratories may request court to order evaluation of laboratory in order for resulting DNA profile to be eligible for entry into state or national DNA index system. Provides that upon request to district attorney, victim has right to receive notice concerning DNA testing proceedings. Specifies when district attorneys must or may provide notification to crime victims.
Title
Relating to post-conviction DNA testing.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Thatcher [R] | Rep. Carla Piluso [D] | Rep. Mike McLane [R] | Sen. Floyd Prozanski [D] |
Sen. James Manning [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] | Rep. Jennifer Williamson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Chapter 368, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 27; Excused, 2--Johnson, Steiner Hayward. |
2019-05-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by McLane. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 1--Williams; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Boles, McLain, Williamson. |
2019-05-29 | House | Carried over to May 30, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-28 | House | Carried over to May 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-27 | House | Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Carried over to May 27, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-22 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-05-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-24 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |