OR SB320 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, June 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, June 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that State Fish and Wildlife Commission may authorize nonprofit organization serving veterans or certain armed forces members to conduct excursions during which veterans or armed forces members may angle or take shellfish with no-charge daily licenses, tags or permits. Authorizes issuance of group license for angling or shellfish to] Provides that State Fish and Wildlife Commission may authorize nonprofit organization serving veterans or certain armed forces members to conduct excursions during which veterans or armed forces members may angle or take shellfish with no-charge daily licenses, tags or permits. Prohibits agent of commission that issues licenses, tags or permits from retaining agent fee for issuance. Sunsets provision on January 2, 2027. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to State Department of Fish and Wildlife licenses; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Effective date, June 15, 2021. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 334, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Grayber, Hayden, Nearman. |
2021-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-01 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Management. |
2021-04-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Heard, Kennemer. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. and be referred to Ways and Means (Printed A-Eng.) Referral denied by order of the President. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |