OR SB32 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Effective date, July 21, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Public Utility Commission to form work group to study methods by which public utility that furnishes natural gas may expand service to areas that do not have access to natural gas. Directs commission to report results of study to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to energy on or before September 15, 2016. Sunsets on January 2, 2017. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to natural gas; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-28SenateEffective date, July 21, 2015.
2015-07-28SenateChapter 754, 2015 Laws.
2015-07-21SenateGovernor signed.
2015-07-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-07-02SenatePresident signed.
2015-06-30SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 25; nays, 3--Ferrioli, Thatcher, Thomsen; excused, 2--Boquist, Olsen.
2015-06-29HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nearman. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Gallegos, Hack, Weidner.
2015-06-29HouseSecond reading.
2015-06-26HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2015-06-24HouseWork Session held.
2015-06-18HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2015-06-18HouseWork Session held.
2015-06-11HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
2015-05-15HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2015-05-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2015-05-12HouseWork Session held.
2015-04-28HousePublic Hearing held.
2015-03-12HouseReferred to Energy and Environment.
2015-03-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2015-03-04SenateThird reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 23; nays, 7--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Gelser, Shields, Thatcher, Thomsen.
2015-03-03SenateCarried over to 03-04 by unanimous consent.
2015-03-02SenateSecond reading.
2015-03-02SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2015-02-25SenateWork Session held.
2015-02-16SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-01-20SenateReferred to Business and Transportation.
2015-01-12SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB32
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB32/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB32/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB32/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB32/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20908
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=331958
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/22321
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23181
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=362678
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=363161

Bill Comments

feedback