OR SB317 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 482, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 482, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expands where state, county or city public bodies may hold public meetings to include locations within Indian country of federally recognized Oregon Indian tribe that is within Oregon.
Title
Relating to public meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-04 | Senate | Chapter 482, 2017 Laws. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Bentz, Boone, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-06-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 14, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-06 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-30 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-04-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to General Government and Accountability. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |