OR SB306 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-21 - Effective date, August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Directs Legislative Revenue Officer to prepare preliminary and final reports on feasibility of statewide clean air fee or tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to state finance; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-21SenateEffective date, August 14, 2013.
2013-08-21SenateChapter 770, 2013 Laws.
2013-08-14SenateGovernor signed.
2013-07-15HouseSpeaker signed.
2013-07-15SenatePresident signed.
2013-07-06HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Bailey. Passed. Ayes, 31; Nays, 28--Barton, Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Fagan, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Jenson, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McKeown, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Weidner.
2013-07-06HouseSecond reading.
2013-07-05HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2013-07-03HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2013-07-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2013-07-03SenateThird reading. Carried by Dingfelder. Passed. Ayes, 18; nays, 12--Baertschiger, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters.
2013-07-02SenateSecond reading.
2013-07-01SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2013-06-28SenateWork Session held.
2013-06-24SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2013-06-24SenateWork Session held.
2013-06-20SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
2013-05-31SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2013-05-31SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng)
2013-05-30SenateWork Session held.
2013-05-29SenateWork Session held.
2013-04-24SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2013-03-18SenatePublic Hearing held.
2013-01-16SenateReferred to Finance and Revenue.
2013-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback