OR SB300 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain persons appointed by Governor and certain persons appointed to positions in executive department serve at pleasure of Governor.
Title
Relating to persons who serve at the pleasure of the Governor; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |