OR SB3 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits community colleges to offer applied baccalaureate degree programs under specified conditions and upon receiving approval from Higher Education Coordinating Commission.
Title
Relating to community colleges offering baccalaureate degrees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 255, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-05-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 45; Nays, 10--Barker, Evans, Helt, Holvey, Marsh, McLain, McLane, Post, Smith Warner, Wallan; Excused, 2--Hernandez, Sprenger; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Nosse, Rayfield, Williamson. |
2019-05-27 | House | Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Carried over to May 27, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-22 | House | Carried over to May 23, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-21 | House | Carried over to May 22, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-20 | House | Carried over to May 21, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-17 | House | Carried over to May 20, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-16 | House | Carried over to May 17, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-15 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Education. |
2019-02-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Wagner, Courtney. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |