OR SB3 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Effective date, June 28, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Effective date, June 28, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to persons with intellectual disability; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to persons with intellectual disability; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Bates [D] | Sen. Peter Courtney [D] | Sen. Richard Devlin [D] | Sen. Chris Edwards [D] |
Sen. Diane Rosenbaum [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | Effective date, June 28, 2011. | |
2011-06-30 | Chapter 544, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-06-29 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-22 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-20 | President signed. | |
2011-06-16 | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Schaufler; Absent, 2--Harker, Lindsay; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Freeman. | |
2011-06-15 | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 16, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-06-14 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-13 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-06-09 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-04-11 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-04-04 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-03-31 | Third reading. Carried by President Courtney. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2011-03-24 | Taken from 03-24 Calendar and placed on 03-31 Calendar on voice vote. | |
2011-03-23 | Second reading. | |
2011-03-23 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-03-17 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to Education and Workforce Development. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |