OR SB297 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date, June 25, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date, June 25, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises qualifications for registration to practice professional engineering, land surveying or photogrammetric mapping. Allows State Board of Examiners for Engineering and Land Surveying to adopt rules establishing alternative to degree requirements. Makes provision for certificate of registration to specify branch of practice for which registrant has qualified. Allows board to waive fundamentals of engineering examination for qualifying person registered or licensed in another jurisdiction. Allows board to refuse registration if applicant has violated statute, rule or professional or ethical standard in another jurisdiction that would be grounds to refuse, suspend or revoke registration in this state. Identifies persons considered in responsible charge of photogrammetric mapping. Revises types of photogrammetric activities for which supervision and control is responsible charge. Revises language regarding examination of applicants for registration. Revises board authority over fees. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to professions regulated by the State Board of Examiners for Engineering and Land Surveying; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Senate | Effective date, June 25, 2015. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Chapter 576, 2015 Laws. |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-06-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barreto. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Buckley, Williamson. |
2015-06-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 16, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-06-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 15, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-06-11 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-06-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-05-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2015-03-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |