OR SB290 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes person voluntarily fighting wildfire immune from civil liability for injury resulting from good faith performance of firefighting efforts. Creates exceptions.
Title
Relating to civil immunity for volunteers fighting wildfires.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] | Rep. Gregory Barreto [R] | Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] |
Sen. Lynn Findley [R] | Rep. Duane Stark [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 245, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-05-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Stark. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Gorsek, Helm, Smith DB, Sprenger, Wilde. |
2019-05-21 | House | Carried over to May 22, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-20 | House | Carried over to May 21, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-17 | House | Carried over to May 20, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-16 | House | Carried over to May 17, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-15 | House | Carried over to May 16, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-14 | House | Carried over to May 15, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-13 | House | Carried over to May 14, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-09 | House | Carried over to May 13, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-08 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Carried over to 04-10 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |