OR SB281 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires manufacturer of digital product to label product with information relating to health risks associated with use of product. Authorizes Oregon Health Authority to adopt rules related to labeling of digital products. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to radiation-emitting wireless digital products; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. Carla Piluso [D] | Sen. Charles Riley [D] |
Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Andrea Salinas [D] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB281 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB281/Introduced |