OR SB277 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Effective date, May 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services to license or register, or to renew licenses or registrations for, certain financial services businesses under agreement with Nationwide Multistate Licensing System. Permits director to conform practices, procedures and information Department of Consumer and Business Services uses to license and register, or to renew licenses or registrations for, certain financial services businesses. Permits director to require license and registration applicants to provide information to Nationwide Multistate Licensing System and to waive some statutory requirements for licensing and registration by rule. Becomes operative 91 days after effective date. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authorizations to engage in certain financial services businesses; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2015-05-12 - House - House (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Committee Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-21SenateEffective date, May 20, 2015.
2015-05-21SenateChapter 118, 2015 Laws.
2015-05-20SenateGovernor signed.
2015-05-15HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-05-14SenatePresident signed.
2015-05-12HousePassed.Ayes, 53; Excused, 3--Gorsek, Keny-Guyer, McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Buckley, Lininger, Williamson, Speaker Kotek.
2015-05-11HouseSecond reading.
2015-05-07HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be placed on Consent Calendar.
2015-05-04HouseWork Session held.
2015-04-27HousePublic Hearing held.
2015-03-05HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2015-02-27HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2015-02-26SenateThird reading. Carried by Girod. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Winters.
2015-02-24SenateCarried over to 02-26 by unanimous consent.
2015-02-19SenateSecond reading.
2015-02-19SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2015-02-11SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2015-01-20SenateReferred to Business and Transportation.
2015-01-12SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback