OR SB277 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes University of Oregon and Portland State University as independent public universities, governed by university boards of directors.
Title
Relating to higher education; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Education and Workforce Development. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |