OR SB271 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies definition of small employer for purposes of group health benefit plans.
Title
Relating to health insurance for small employers.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Committee Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Committee Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Chapter 142, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-05-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-15 | House | Read third time under Consent Calendar. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Boone, McKeown, Piluso. |
2017-05-11 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be placed on Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Dembrow. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Carried over to 02-23 by unanimous consent. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Carried over to 02-21 by unanimous consent. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |