OR SB270 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-21 - Effective date, August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-21 - Effective date, August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes governing boards for University of Oregon and Portland State University.
Title
Relating to the establishment of institutional boards for public universities in the Oregon University System; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-21 | Senate | Effective date, August 14, 2013. |
2013-08-21 | Senate | Chapter 768, 2013 Laws. |
2013-08-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-07-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 25; nays, 4--Boquist, Girod, Kruse, Prozanski; excused, 1--Starr. |
2013-07-06 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Buckley. Passed. Ayes, 44; Nays, 15--Bentz, Berger, Clem, Gelser, Gilliam, Gomberg, Greenlick, Holvey, Krieger, Parrish, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Witt; Excused, 1--Weidner. |
2013-07-06 | House | Second reading. |
2013-07-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed. |
2013-07-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-07-03 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 23; nays, 7--Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Prozanski, Shields. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng) |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Education and Workforce Development. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |