OR SB266 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Department of Human Services to consider specified factors in assessing whether residential care facility or facility with memory care endorsement has qualified awake direct care staff in sufficient numbers to meet scheduled and unscheduled needs of each resident 24 hours a day. Requires Department of Human Services to consider specified factors in assessing whether residential care facility or facility with memory care endorsement has qualified awake direct care staff in sufficient numbers to meet scheduled and unscheduled needs of each resident 24 hours a day. Requires entity that investigates abuse complaint at facility to provide initial status report to agency that licenses facility. Adds requirements regarding investigation of complaints that facility does not have qualified awake direct care staff in sufficient numbers to meet scheduled and unscheduled needs of each resident 24 hours a day. Requires department to prioritize health, welfare, safety and rights of residents in regulating residential care facilities and long term care facilities. Requires department to impose condition on license of residential care facility or long term care facility in response to finding of immediate jeopardy. Requires framework developed by department for assessing regulatory compliance of residential care facilities to include measures of whether facility has qualified awake direct care staff in sufficient numbers to consistently meet scheduled and unscheduled needs of each resident 24 hours a day and impact of any compliance deficiencies on rights, health, welfare and safety of residents. Requires department to post on facility finder website notice that facility is in enhanced oversight and supervision program. Requires department, no later than April 1, 2022, to publish and distribute framework to facilities, fully implement enhanced oversight and supervision programs and report to Legislative Assembly on publishing and distribution of framework and implementation of enhanced oversight and supervision program. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to licensure of long term care facilities; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-07SenateEffective date, September 25, 2021.
2021-07-07SenateChapter 392, 2021 Laws.
2021-06-23SenateGovernor signed.
2021-06-15HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-14SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-09SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 22; Nays, 8--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen.
2021-06-07HouseThird reading. Carried by Ruiz. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Grayber, Hayden, Nearman.
2021-06-03HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-02HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-01HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-27HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2021-05-19HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-17HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-05-11HouseReferred to Human Services.
2021-05-04HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-29SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Robinson.
2021-04-29SenateThird reading. Carried by Anderson, Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 5--Boquist, Girod, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Findley, Heard, Kennemer.
2021-04-28SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-04-13SenateWork Session held.
2021-04-08SenateWork Session held.
2021-04-01SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB266
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB266/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB266/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB266/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB266/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB266/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB266/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32051
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=518566
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32574
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=527935
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=528886

Bill Comments 750

feedback