OR SB266 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-21 - Effective date, August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates individualized process for Oregon University System to enter into financing agreements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to financing agreements; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-21SenateEffective date, August 14, 2013.
2013-08-21SenateChapter 767, 2013 Laws.
2013-08-14SenateGovernor signed.
2013-07-15HouseSpeaker signed.
2013-07-15SenatePresident signed.
2013-07-07HouseThird reading. Carried by Smith. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 3--Thatcher, Weidner, Whisnant.
2013-07-06HouseRules suspended. Second reading.
2013-07-06HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2013-07-06HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2013-07-06HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2013-07-06SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 28; nays, 2--Ferrioli, George.
2013-07-06SenateSecond reading.
2013-07-05SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2013-07-03SenateWork Session held.
2013-07-03SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2013-07-03SenateWork Session held.
2013-06-14SenatePublic Hearing held.
2013-06-11SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2013-04-11SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2013-04-11SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng)
2013-04-09SenateWork Session held.
2013-02-28SenatePublic Hearing held.
2013-01-18SenateReferred to Education and Workforce Development.
2013-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback