OR SB265 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-21 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-21 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes issuance of higher education revenue bonds in addition to bonds authorized pursuant to biennial budget process for bond authorization.
Title
Relating to higher education revenue bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-21 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2014. |
2013-08-21 | Senate | Chapter 766, 2013 Laws. |
2013-08-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-07-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith. Passed. Ayes, 59; Nays, 1--Thatcher. |
2013-07-06 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2013-07-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-07-06 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 28; nays, 2--Ferrioli, George. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Education and Workforce Development, then Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |