OR SB260 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-21 - Effective date, August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that qualifying bicycle and pedestrian projects may receive loans from Multimodal Transportation Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Multimodal Transportation Fund; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-21SenateEffective date, August 14, 2013.
2013-08-21SenateChapter 765, 2013 Laws.
2013-08-14SenateGovernor signed.
2013-07-15HouseSpeaker signed.
2013-07-15SenatePresident signed.
2013-07-08HousePotential conflict(s) of interest declared by Thatcher.
2013-07-08HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Read. Passed. Ayes, 44; Nays, 14--Bentz, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Richardson, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Boone, Keny-Guyer.
2013-07-08HouseRules suspended. Second reading.
2013-07-08HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2013-07-08HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2013-07-08HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2013-07-08SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 22; nays, 7--Boquist, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Kruse, Whitsett, Winters; excused, 1--Starr.
2013-07-08SenateRules Suspended. Second reading.
2013-07-08SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2013-07-07SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2013-07-07SenateWork Session held.
2013-07-07SenateWork Session held.
2013-07-07SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2013-04-04SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
2013-04-02SenateWork Session held.
2013-02-19SenatePublic Hearing held.
2013-01-16SenateReferred to Business and Transportation, then Ways and Means.
2013-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback