OR SB256 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals sunset on moratorium on oil, gas and sulfur leasing in territorial sea. Prohibits Department of State Lands from leasing submerged and submersible lands within territorial sea for exploration, development or production of oil, gas or sulfur in territorial sea or for activities in furtherance of exploration, development or production within federal waters adjacent to territorial sea.
Title
Relating to ocean resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Chapter 14, 2019 Laws. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-03-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-03-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg, Smith DB. Passed. Ayes, 47; Nays, 8--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Sprenger, Stark; Excused, 5--Boles, Greenlick, McLane, Williams, Witt. |
2019-03-18 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2019-02-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Heard. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Carried over to 02-19 by unanimous consent. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |